THE VECTORCOMMAND FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The VectorCommand Foundation Aims and Purpose are: 1. To fund the research science behind Operational Incident Command. 2. To gather worldwide Best Practice in Operational Incident Command and publish in the public domain. 3. To disseminate Best Practice in Operational Incident Command as widely as possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
Governance
- 30 April 2003: Standard registration
- 09 June 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE VECTOR COMMAND FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5 | £3 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 08 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 08 March 2016 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
2.1 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST RESEARCH INTO THE METHODS OF MANAGING CRITICAL INCIDENTS (INCLUDING FIRES AND MAJOR TRANSPORT INCIDENTS) FOR THE PROTECTION OF LIFE AND PROPERTY, TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE TRAINING OF FIRE BRIGADE PERSONNEL AND TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF THE FIRE SERVICE AS A WHOLE. 2.2 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROTECT HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF THE FIRE SERVICES IN THE EVENT OF AN EMERGENCY OR LOCAL OR NATIONAL DISASTER BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE MANAGEMENT OF CRITICAL INCIDENTS; ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE FIRE SERVICE BY THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES AND IN SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS (HAMPSHIRE)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window