ROSPA ADVANCED DRIVERS AND RIDERS-MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manchester Group of RoSPA Advanced Drivers and Riders run advanced driving and riding courses for any qualified driver 18 years or over seeking to improve their driving or riding skills by becoming safer, more skillful drivers and riders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
Governance
- 21 November 2000: Standard registration
- MANCHESTER GROUP ROADAR (Working name)
- MANCHESTER GROUP OF ROSPA ADVANCED DRIVERS AND RIDERS (Previous name)
- MANCHESTER GROUP OF ROSPA ADVANCED DRIVERS AND RIDERS (Previous name)
- ROSPA ADVANCED DRIVERS ASSOCIATION MANCHESTER GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Freeman | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Watson | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Roberts | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Winnard | Trustee | 03 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAREN ALEXANDER COX | Trustee | 28 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
LEE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.80k | £964 | £1.38k | £2.91k | £2.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.23k | £1.45k | £1.07k | £2.27k | £3.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 14 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAR 1984 AS AMENDED ON 14 MAR 1989 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAR 1994 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAR 1997 AS AMENDED ON 14 MAR 2000 AS AMENDED ON 31 OCT 2000 AS AMENDED ON 13 MAR 2001 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAR 2006 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2010 AS AMENDED ON 08 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE GROUP ARE FOR THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF STANDARD OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY IN THE MANCHESTER AREA.
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 SYCAMORE PLACE
WHITEFIELD
MANCHESTER
M45 7FQ
- Phone:
- 0300 030 3001
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window