HASHIM WELFARE HOSPITAL APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The relief of sickness in rural Pakistan, in particular by assisting in the provision and management of a hospital. 2. The advancement of education in rural Pakistan, in particular by the provision of books and scholarships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- Pakistan
Governance
- 07 September 2000: Standard registration
- HWH APPEAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MOHAMMAD IDREES AWAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Usman Ameer Khan | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tariq Zaman | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Shahid Anis Khan Prof | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Mohammed Ayaz Asghar | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
SAJID MAHMOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.19k | £123.44k | £106.61k | £183.09k | £140.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.21k | £109.39k | £103.72k | £124.45k | £169.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED 14 AUGUST 2000
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN RURAL PAKISTAN IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF A HOSPITAL. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN RURAL PAKISTAN IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF BOOKS AND SCHOLARSHIPS.
Area of benefit
RURAL PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
103 WALTON ROAD
WOKING
SURREY
GU21 5DW
- Phone:
- 01483762774
- Email:
- info@hashimwelfare.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window