Financial history DISABILITY POSITIVE

Charity number: 1091744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.55m £2.35m £2.73m £3.17m £3.88m
Total expenditure £2.40m £2.20m £2.49m £3.21m £3.81m
Income from government contracts £1.95m £1.94m £1.83m £1.87m £1.88m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.74k £5.58k £57.51k £169 £2.27k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £262.40k £813.93k £1.29m
Income - Charitable activities £2.46m £2.29m £2.28m £2.33m £2.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £32.03k £29.80k £22.86k £25.14k £114.44k
Income - Other £59.05k £25.00k £104.30k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.40m £2.20m £2.26m £2.40m £2.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £22.25k £529.07k £9.87k £13.28k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £237.56k £817.02k £1.26m