DISABILITY POSITIVE

Charity number: 1091744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are Disability Positive. We provide services, opportunities and a voice to people living with disability and long-term health conditions. We have services to help people with everyday life and being part of their local community. We offer advice, help with practical tasks and advocate for people in lots of different situations and we share peoples' experiences to influence positive change.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Lancashire
  • Liverpool City
  • Manchester City
  • Warrington
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 April 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • Cheshire Centre for Independent Living (Working name)
  • CHESHIRE CENTRE FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING (Previous name)
  • CHESHIRE DISABILITIES FEDERATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sara Gretton Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Jackson Mills Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Clare Martin Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Michael Morrison Trustee 19 July 2022
None on record
Amie Bridson Trustee 29 June 2022
None on record
Paula Doone Gilbart Trustee 06 May 2022
None on record
Anne Elizabeth Toone Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Andrew James Galbraith Trustee 04 January 2022
None on record
Dr Miro Griffiths Trustee 17 December 2020
None on record
Christopher James Warren Trustee 28 February 2020
None on record
Dr Judith Margaret Ford Trustee 17 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.55m £2.35m £2.73m £3.17m £3.88m
Total expenditure £2.40m £2.20m £2.49m £3.21m £3.81m
Income from government contracts £1.95m £1.94m £1.83m £1.87m £1.88m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.74k £5.58k £57.51k £169 £2.27k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £262.40k £813.93k £1.29m
Income - Charitable activities £2.46m £2.29m £2.28m £2.33m £2.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £32.03k £29.80k £22.86k £25.14k £114.44k
Income - Other £59.05k £25.00k £104.30k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.40m £2.20m £2.26m £2.40m £2.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £22.25k £529.07k £9.87k £13.28k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £237.56k £817.02k £1.26m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £607.62k £590.27k £586.55k £568.68k £549.24k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.15m £1.34m £1.50m £1.64m £1.58m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £383.84k £398.66k £326.83k £494.13k £340.94k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SENSION HOUSE
DENTON DRIVE
NORTHWICH
CHESHIRE
CW9 7LU
Phone:
08453402777