Accounts and annual returns AID FOR CHILDREN OF EL SALVADOR

Charity number: 1082386
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 14 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 14 November 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 December 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 January 2017 On Time