Financial history AID FOR CHILDREN OF EL SALVADOR

Charity number: 1082386
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £44.24k £46.31k £36.72k £28.58k £26.33k
Total expenditure £40.13k £40.34k £31.92k £32.24k £61.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A