AID FOR CHILDREN OF EL SALVADOR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary objective is the relief of need, hardship and distress among children in El Salvador.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- El Salvador
Governance
- 12 September 2000: Standard registration
- 14 December 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- ACES (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.24k | £46.31k | £36.72k | £28.58k | £26.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.13k | £40.34k | £31.92k | £32.24k | £61.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 14 November 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 10 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
10 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
26 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 29 JULY 2000.
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONGST CHILDREN IN EL SALVADOR B) THROUGH SUPPORTING DAY CENTRES AND REFUGEES FOR DEPRIVED CHILDREN IN EL SALVADOR; ASSISTING THE ACCESS OF DEPRIVED CHILDREN TO EDUCATION AND HEALTH SERVICES AND THE BASIC NECESSITIES OF LIFE; COUNSELLING DYSFUNCTIONAL FAMILIES IN POOR COMMUNITIES; BUILDING NETWORKS OF SUPPORTING BETWEEN THE UK AND EL SALVADOR AND ELSEWHERE; RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF THESE CHILDREN; AND FURTHERING ANY OTHER MEASURES THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM APPROPRIATE FOR THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING, DEPRIVATION AND UNDER-PRIVILEGE AMONG CHILDREN IN EL SALVADOR.
Area of benefit
EL SALVADOR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window