BRITISH BENGALI WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 26 November 2001: Standard registration
- BRITISH BANGLADESH WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AFZAL HUSSAIN SIDDIQUE MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAYRUL ISLAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERA MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AHBAB HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NANU MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALINA BEGUM SIMU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.25k | £33.28k | £6.93k | £9.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.99k | £19.27k | £7.96k | £12.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1562 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1562 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD APRIL 1999, AS AMENDED 1ST NOVEMBER 2001 AND 13TH SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED TO: (I) RELIEVE NEED PARTICULARLY AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS, ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN BANGLADESH PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BRITISH-BENGALI AND OTHER ETHNIC MINORITY PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON HOUSING, WELFARE BENEFITS, COUNCIL TAX, THE FILLING OUT OF FORMS, JOB APPLICATIONS AND SKILLS AND BY THE PROVISION OF TRANSLATION SERVICES AND OTHER ASSISTANCE. (II) ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY AMONGST BRITISH-BENGALI AND OTHER ETHNIC MINORITY PEOPLE SPECIALLY LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS AND GREATER LONDON BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY CLASSES, MOTHER TONGUE CLASSES, ART CLASSES AND EDUCATIONAL ADVICE TO PARENTS. (III) ASSIST CHILDREN, YOUNG, ADULT AND ELDERLY PEOPLE OF BRITISH BENGALI AND OTHER ETHNIC MINORITIES OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND BANGLADESH AND SPECIALLY THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE ACTIVITIES TO EDUCATE AND TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW UP WITH FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED AND ALSO TO ACHIEVE THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE CONCERNING LEGAL AND ILLEGAL DRUGS.
Area of benefit
PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window