THE MARINA KLEINWORT TRUST
Charity Number: 1081825
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Current policy is to consider written appeals from charities working in the field of the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 July 2017
Total income: £24,873
Total expenditure: £1,453,305
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 02 August 2000: Standard registration
- 12 November 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 12 November 2018: Funds transferred to 1139904 THE MASTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- THE MARINA KLEINWORT CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/07/2013 | 06/07/2014 | 06/07/2015 | 06/07/2016 | 06/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.83k | £49.83k | £47.49k | £41.21k | £24.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.63k | £60.63k | £51.96k | £216.49k | £1.45m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 July 2017 | 05 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 July 2016 | 05 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 July 2016 | 05 April 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 06 July 2015 | 22 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 July 2015 | 22 April 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 6 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window