Accounts and annual returns THE 1940 DUNKIRK VETERANS' MEMORIAL BENEVOLENT TRUST FUND
Charity number: 1081787
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 05 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 29 May 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 05 June 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 22 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 09 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 25 April 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 31 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window