THE TWO RIDINGS COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to encourage philanthropy and build a long term endowment to enable grant making that meets the needs of our local community now and in the future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of York
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- YORK AND NORTH YORKSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £269.73k | £402.97k | £433.30k | £2.20m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £323.92k | £429.64k | £265.04k | £1.29m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £821.15k | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.84m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £315.23k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £90.22k | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £134.47k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.23m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £54.83k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.05k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £585.64k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 15 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 26 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 26 June 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 01 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 01 December 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05/10/2000 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 02/02/2011
Charitable objects
A) THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE CITY OF YORK, THE COUNTY OF NORTH YORKSHIRE, THE COUNTY OF THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE AND THE CITY OF HULL, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH (BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL), AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS; B) OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WHICH ARE, IN THE OPINION OF THE BOARD, BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE IN THE CHARITY'S AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF YORK ,THE COUNTY OF NORTH YORKSHIRE, THE COUNTY OF THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE AND THE CITY OF HULL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window