Accounts and annual returns WEOLEY CASTLE COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 1084449
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 08 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 07 February 2013 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 07 February 2013 7 days late
Annual return 31 March 2011 21 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 21 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2009 18 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 20 September 2010 On Time