Financial history WEOLEY CASTLE COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 1084449
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £177.40k £77.76k £122.61k £59.79k £0
Total expenditure £191.65k £80.38k £121.68k £55.58k £7.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A