FREEDOM IN CHRIST MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training and equipping of Christian leaders. Provision of resources for churches. Offers advice to church leaders and others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 September 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Elizabeth Brewer | Chair | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Arthur William Moore | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Graham Wren | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Hendley | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|||||
REVD DR RODNEY DALE WOODS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.34k | £200.47k | £190.07k | £221.23k | £243.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £247.30k | £200.37k | £210.95k | £230.16k | £240.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JUNE 2009.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS IN CHRISTIAN CHURCHES OF ALL DENOMINATIONS IN COUNSELLING AND PASTORAL SKILLS BASED UPON CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Beacontree Plaza
Gillette Way
READING
RG2 0BS
- Phone:
- 01183218084
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window