ECCLESIASTICAL AND THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN

Charity Number: 1082067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim of the charity is the education of men who intend to be ordained as priests and serve in the Greek Orthodox Archidiocese Of Thyateira And Great Britain. The properties acquired in 2001 and 2002 provide suitable teaching environment to part-time and volunteer teachers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £77,640
Total expenditure: £53,369

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 August 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Archbishop Nikitas Lioulias Chair 12 June 2019
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF COVENTRY
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST CONSTANTINE AND ST HELEN
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF HOLY ANARGYRI TRUST
Received: On time
ST JOHN THE BAPTIST GREEK ORTHODOX TRUST
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST KATHERINE
Received: On time
ST NICHOLAS GREEK ORTHODOX EDUCATIONAL CENTRE
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF BRISTOL
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN CHRYSOSTOM IN CHELTENHAM AND ENVIRONS
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Received: 90 days late
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST GEORGE THE MARTYR
Received: On time
Sts. Barbara, Phanourius and Paul the Apostle Greek Orthodox Church
Received: On time
SAINT NICHOLAS GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE)
Received: On time
ST BARNABAS GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY FUND
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF MILTON KEYNES AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Received: On time
Father Christodoulos Christodoulou Trustee 22 July 2021
OLIVE BRANCH AID
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH OF SAINT NECTARIOS
Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX THYATEIRA YOUTH
Received: 42 days late
Nikolaos Tsimalis Trustee 22 July 2021
CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX THYATEIRA YOUTH
Received: 42 days late
ANTONIS YEROLEMOU Trustee
None on record
MARINA KALOGHIROU Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £63.92k £71.00k £61.57k £75.33k £77.64k
Total expenditure £39.54k £32.05k £39.91k £45.42k £53.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 March 2024 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 March 2024 147 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Archdiocese of Thyateira
5 Craven Hill
LONDON
W2 3EN
Phone:
02073234450