Financial history THE YOUNG PERSON'S RESOURCE CENTRE - PORT TALBOT

Charity number: 1089061
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £143.89k £186.27k £200.92k £185.35k £133.87k
Total expenditure £146.13k £199.20k £209.21k £208.09k £156.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A