THE YOUNG PERSON'S RESOURCE CENTRE - PORT TALBOT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the charity is to educate and assist young people in Neath Port Talbot Borough Council area in particular but not exclusively by provision of advice, information and such offer services calculated to develop their physical and mental capacities in order that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society and that their conditions of life maybe improved
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 25 October 2001: Standard registration
- 24 June 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE HIDEOUT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.89k | £186.27k | £200.92k | £185.35k | £133.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.13k | £199.20k | £209.21k | £208.09k | £156.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 11 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 29 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 29 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 27 May 2009 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 19 February 2009 | 19 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED 2 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE NEATH PORT TALBOT PORT TALBOT COUNTY BOROUGH COUNCIL AREA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES CALCULATED TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NEATH PORT TALBOT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window