Trustees BRIDGWATER OPERATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1089254

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Peters | Chair | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Dodden | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Rosalind Dolding | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Lewin | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Holliday | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Priddle | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Irene Baker | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gina Mear | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Tucker | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darren Roy Baker | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lewis White | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katie Williams | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kirby Warren | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Creswick | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY MICHAEL EDWARDS | Trustee | 01 September 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.