Financial history NORTH WEST LUNG CENTRE

Charity Number: 1090320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.66m £15.87m £17.50m £18.97m £19.57m
Total expenditure £9.98m £12.47m £13.06m £15.09m £12.98m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £19.65k £215.25k £17.19k £61.68k £410.69k
Income - Other trading activities £11.58m £15.54m £17.28m £18.69m £18.69m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £48.74k £112.59k £147.42k £225.59k £449.65k
Income - Other £0 £0 £55.20k £0 £27.13k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £31.66k £384.03k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.28m £1.33m £1.54m £2.10m £901.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds £667.31k £11.14m £11.52m £11.73k £11.47k
Expenditure - Governance £54.08k £22.01k £21.24k £21.29k £22.74k
Expenditure - Grants institution £602.21k £1.30m £0 £2.08m £850.77k
Expenditure - Investment management £11.03k £11.38k £12.54k £11.73k £11.47k
Expenditure - Other £28.77k £0 £0 £12.97m £12.07m