Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST PETERSBURG PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1085262
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2013 03 December 2014 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2012 22 August 2013 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2011 22 August 2013 388 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required