NORTH LONDON WOMEN GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE ADVICE AND GUIDANCE ON WELFARE BENEFIT ADVOCACY, INTERPRETING AND TRANSLATION, ESCORT FRENCH SPEAKERS TO DIFFERENT SERVICE PROVIDER ACROSS LONDON, AND ESPECIALLY WE ARE BASED IN ISLINGTON. WE RUN AFTER SCHOOL CLUB FOR CHILDREN AGED 5-16, TEACHING FRENCH & CULTURAL ACTIVITIES. WE ALSO RUN ACTIVITIES FOR OLDER PEOPLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 April 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
- Enfield
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 14 February 2001: Standard registration
- NORTH LONDON WOMEN GROUP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULINE MAYEKA MUMBAYA | Chair | 20 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Jade Luntala | Trustee | 21 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karine Lemfu | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Betty Baongola | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ahondju Shango Treasurer | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lusau Mimi Kitoko | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
BETY BAONGOLA | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/04/2019 | 13/04/2020 | 13/04/2021 | 13/04/2022 | 13/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £200 | £150 | £250 | £15.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.25k | £190 | £145 | £280 | £13.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 April 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2024 | |||
Annual return | 13 April 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2023 | |||
Annual return | 13 April 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2022 | |||
Annual return | 13 April 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2021 | |||
Annual return | 13 April 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH NOVEMBER 1999, AS AMENDED 11TH NOVEMBER 2000 AND 13TH JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF AFRICAN SUB-SAHARAN REFUGEE WOMEN RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE ON HEALTH MATTERS, HOUSING AND IMMIGRATION AND BY THE PROVISION OF INTERPRETING AND ADVOCACY SERVICES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 LAZAR WALK
LONDON
N7 7RR
- Phone:
- 07415335296
- Email:
- BAKAND@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window