Accounts and annual returns STRATFORD MAGISTRATES COURT POOR BOX TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1081843
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 September 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 02 September 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 02 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 02 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 02 September 2009 04 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 September 2009 Not Required
Annual return 02 September 2008 06 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 September 2008 Not Required