MEASHAM MOBILITY BUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide door to door transport with a Mini-bus for Local disabled/mobility impaired individuals of an organised group for shopping/social outings/enterainment and leisure purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 03 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD ALAN OAKES rasgoakes@gmail.com | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mary Nicholl | Trustee | 15 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA WATERWORTH | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
THERESA BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.74k | £7.18k | £5.77k | £3.37k | £3.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.10k | £502 | £2.01k | £3.31k | £2.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 07 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED ON 12 DECEMBER 2000 AND 20 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF MEASHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) OR POVERTYCOULD NOT OTHERWISE OBTAIN THROUGH LACK OF MEANS 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE IMPROVEMENT AND DIFFUSION OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE LAW AND THE PRACTICE OF THE LAW AND THE ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE HAVING REGARD ESPECIALLY TO THOSE AREAS OF THE LAW AND THE ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE HAVING REGARD ESPECIALLY TO THOSE AREAS OF THE LAW WHICH ARE OF PARTICULAR CONCERN TO POOR PEOPLE OR ARE DIRECTED TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY 3) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE CITY OF COVENTRY
Area of benefit
MEASHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
CANAL HOUSE
CHAPEL STREET
MEASHAM
SWADLINCOTE
DE12 7JD
- Phone:
- 01530271344
- Email:
- rasgoakes@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window