ST THOMAS' CHILDREN'S CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating on the site of St Thomas' C of E Primary school : we run Breakfast Club, Pre-school, After school Kids club and 3 week Summer Holday club. 12 staff employed. Over 160 children use the Centre per week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income includes £130,106 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 14 July 2000: Standard registration
- 15 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.48k | £195.42k | £217.89k | £224.59k | £238.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.53k | £179.42k | £213.99k | £225.38k | £225.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £139.81k | £142.19k | £130.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 07 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 07 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 24 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 24 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 11 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 11 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 22 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
22 July 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/06/2000 AS AMENDED ON 13/10/2009 AS AMENDED ON 28/02/2013 AS AMENDED ON 11/10/2012
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION, DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS, AND FOR CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE DURING SCHOOL HOURS B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window