HORNCASTLE HISTORY & HERITAGE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anything to do with Horncastle, past, present and future
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 24 August 2000: Standard registration
- HORNCASTLE CIVIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DAVID TREVERTON BUTTERWORTH | Chair |
|
||||||
Nicholas George Fox | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM DAVID SILVERTON | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.69k | £8.16k | £7.86k | £14.60k | £8.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.74k | £10.28k | £5.01k | £14.71k | £7.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/06/2000 AS AMENDED ON 15/05/2014
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT (2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT (3) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HORNCASTLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Joseph Banks Centre
7 - 13 Bridge Street
Horncastle
Lincolnshire
LN9 5HZ
- Phone:
- 01507622749
- Email:
- info@horncastlecivic.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window