THE HIGHCREST ACADEMY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School fund monies raised by fundraising and charity events. Money then given to needy individuals, selected charities or to purchase items for school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 09 November 2000: Standard registration
- THE HATTERS LANE SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
- THE HIGHCREST COMMUNITY SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glen Darren Burke | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Macbeth | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.19k | £6.94k | £7.36k | £5.37k | £4.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.51k | £8.20k | £6.39k | £6.68k | £4.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2025 | 359 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08/06/2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/07/2002 AS AMENDED ON 08/12/2011
Charitable objects
IN THE HIGHCREST COMMUNITY SCHOOL, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE HIGHCREST ACADEMY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE SUPPLIED UNDER ANY FUNDING ARRANGEMENT OR AGREEMENT WITH THE DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION AND/OR LOCAL AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
HIGH WYCOMBE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUSINESS MANAGER
The Highcrest Academy
Hatters Lane
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP13 7NQ
- Phone:
- 01494 529866
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window