Financial history LITCHAM SCHOOL CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 1082615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.82k £378 £965 £1.30k £2.98k
Total expenditure £1.63k £19.10k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A