LITCHAM SCHOOL CHARITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to Cancer Trusts etc. Agreed expenditure on exceptional school items, as fully agreed by Governing body.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Norfolk
Governance
- 26 September 2000: Standard registration
- LITCHAM HIGH SCHOOL CHARITY FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY JAMES HINCHLIFFE | Chair | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
James Plummer | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Juniper | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Webster | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Gibbs | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Madden | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR ROBIN HANLEY | Trustee | 09 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sarah White | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.82k | £378 | £965 | £1.30k | £2.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.63k | £19.10k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 FEBRUARY 2000. AS AMENDED ON 13 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF LITCHAM HIGH SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY OR THE DEPARTMENT FOR EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES MAY UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SCHOOL AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
LITCHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Litcham School
Church Street
Litcham
KING'S LYNN
PE32 2NS
- Phone:
- 01328701265
- Email:
- office@litchamschool.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window