YMDDIRIEDOLAETH PENLLERGARE - THE PENLLERGARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration and regeneration of the historic and cultural landscape of Penllergare Swansea for public benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £62,958 from 7 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
108 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 22 August 2000: Standard registration
- YMDDIRIEDOLAETH YR PENLLERGARE - THE PENLLERGARE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Andrew James | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA ELIZABETH WATKIN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Poppy Alice Brenchley Reynolds | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raymond James Butt | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ciaran Joseph O'Brien | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN RICHARDS | Trustee | 27 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL CHILDS | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BAKER | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|||||
HELEN THOMAS | Trustee | 04 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.62m | £595.51k | £525.58k | £689.39k | £452.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £410.80k | £417.58k | £498.18k | £570.29k | £620.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.23k | £68.19k | £202.72k | £37.32k | £62.96k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £95.81k | £183.73k | £26.64k | £131.69k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £148.50k | £89.47k | £200.63k | £200.26k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.35m | £308.31k | £288.06k | £342.23k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.80k | £754 | £231 | £455 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £16.83k | £13.24k | £10.02k | £14.76k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £306.96k | £335.89k | £376.98k | £453.99k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £103.83k | £81.69k | £121.20k | £116.30k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.57k | £6.25k | £7.81k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/12/2002
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AT PENLLERGARE AND ITS SETTING IN SWANSEA, TO FURTHER:- (A) THE PROTECTION, CONSERVATION, RESTORATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CULTURAL LANDSCAPE OF PENLLERGARE. (B) KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF PENLLERGARE. (C) THE PROTECTION AND CONSERVATION OF WILDLIFE.
Area of benefit
PENLLERGARE AND ITS SETTING IN SWANSEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
PENLLERGARE VALLEY WOODS
PENLLERGAER
SWANSEA
SA4 9GS
- Phone:
- 01792 344224
- Email:
- contact@penllergare.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window