HOTHAM SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1081708
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

supporting educational aims of the school

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023

Total income: £18,836
Total expenditure: £15,545

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HOTHAM SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Mitchell Trustee 06 July 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2019 01/09/2020 01/09/2021 01/09/2022 01/09/2023
Total gross income £22.33k £9.96k £15.42k £42.31k £18.84k
Total expenditure £18.40k £18.89k £9.95k £17.02k £15.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2023 17 September 2024 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2022 02 October 2023 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 02 October 2023 93 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 September 2021 05 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 05 December 2021 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 10 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hotham Primary School
Charlwood Road
LONDON
SW15 1PN
Phone:
020 8788 6468
Website:

No information available