Financial history DARK HORSE THEATRE

Charity number: 1082267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £100.10k £135.06k £116.43k £170.55k £149.40k
Total expenditure £104.46k £111.23k £154.79k £168.96k £147.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £30.03k £32.38k £28.50k