CAFE 100

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cyber cafe involving the following activities: Internet access,use of computers, computer games, cafe, pool table, music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kirklees
Governance
- 17 April 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIAM ROOT | Chair | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Louise Moorhouse | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Andriy Buchkovskyy | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Kenneth Dunn | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Whitelaw | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.73k | £15.53k | £4.24k | £20.40k | £5.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.79k | £8.59k | £9.03k | £14.06k | £5.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £578 | £2.40k | N/A | £4.29k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 November 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN FOURTEEN AND SEVENTEEN IN HOLMFIRTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND TO ASSIST THEM TO GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. (B) TO RELIEVE YOUNG PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES RESIDING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FREE INFORMATION, ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND ASSISTANCE AND OTHER SERVICES WHICH SUCH PERSONS WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO ATTEND. (C) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A YOUTH CENTRE AND MANAGE SUCH A CENTRE
Area of benefit
HOLMFIRTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Towngate
Holmfirth
HD9 1HA
- Phone:
- 07766183221
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window