AFRICAN WOMEN'S CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AWC provides advice, information, advocacy, mentoring, training and support services to BME women, young girls and families including migrants, refugees and asylum seekers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £119,700 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Uganda
Governance
- 20 November 2000: Standard registration
- WOMEN'S CARE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Wilson | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ATIM | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||
JACKIE KIPWOLA | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MAGARET AKULLO | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
LILLIAN OLANYA | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.29k | £121.40k | £165.22k | £242.35k | £327.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.07k | £128.16k | £152.07k | £245.52k | £247.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.66k | £2.50k | £20.00k | £42.00k | £119.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH JULY 1999, AS AMENDED 28TH OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREATER LONDON AND ELSEWHERE IN PARTICULAR THOSE INHABITANTS WHO ARE WOMEN OF AFRICAN ORIGIN:- (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION; (11) TO PRESERVE AN PROTECT PUBLIC HEALTH; (111) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; (1V) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF THOSE FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canalside House
383 Ladbroke Grove Road
North Kensington
LONDON
W10 5AA
- Phone:
- 02089698389
- Email:
- info@africanwomencare.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window