Accounts and annual returns ARNOS VALE CEMETERY TRUST

Charity Number: 1089027
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 05 May 2009 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 23 April 2009 82 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 26 January 2009 361 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 02 May 2008 92 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 06 March 2006 34 days late