Financial history BRIXHAM BATTERY HERITAGE CENTRE GROUP

Charity number: 1082171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.14k £24.75k £21.97k £15.54k £22.63k
Total expenditure £9.95k £20.26k £23.04k £15.67k £22.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.57k £10.67k N/A £7.50k