STREET CHILDREN OF PERU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Street Children of Peru raises funds to be used to provide homes for homeless children in Peru, including purchase of land, construction, fixtures and fittings, clothing, food, school materials, health provision and student bursaries. An holistic and partnership approach aims to carry the children towards independent adulthood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Peru
Governance
- 08 September 2000: Standard registration
- SCOP PERUKIDS (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOLYON WEBBER | Chair | 01 August 2000 |
|
|
||||
JORDAN RAWLINGS | Trustee | 28 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SAM ROBINSON | Trustee | 28 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
IAN THOMAS | Trustee | 01 August 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120 | £281 | £11 | £5 | £363 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 April 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 AUGUST 2000
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR AMONG THE STREET CHILDREN OF PERU.
Area of benefit
PARTICULAR AMONG THE STREET CHILDREN OF PERU
Contact information
- Address:
-
119 Morse Road
Norton Fitzwarren
TA2 6BS
- Phone:
- 07554 822 713
- Email:
- scop@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window