Trustees BERINSFIELD INFORMATION AND VOLUNTEER CENTRE
Charity number: 1082301

Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gregg Hodgkins | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Hawksworth | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Rhodes MBE | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Brenen | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Ely | Trustee | 16 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Clarke | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD LENNON | Trustee | 07 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.