Financial history THE WEST WIGHT ARTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1081794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £28.77k £6.45k £31.03k £30.53k £34.48k
Total expenditure £22.36k £19.27k £19.35k £20.21k £20.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A