THE WEST WIGHT ARTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We give bursaries on a biennial basis. We hold professional classical music concerts often featuring young artists from the Young Classical Artists Trust. We own a Steinway grand piano, which is available to other organisations and charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 31 July 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH HUNT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gillian Eleanor Hodson | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Philpot | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Wilkins | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Louise Wedgwood | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE WARNER | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hugh Dawson | Trustee | 07 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
harriet emma gibbins | Trustee | 10 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS JAMES KELMAN | Trustee | 15 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH SARAH WASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH BOWDEN BRETTELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.77k | £6.45k | £31.03k | £30.53k | £34.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.36k | £19.27k | £19.35k | £20.21k | £20.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 13 MAY 2000. as amended on 11 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC AND DRAMA IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS, BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC PROFESSIONAL OR AMATEUR PERFORMANCES; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ISLE OF WIGHT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Belvedere
Victoria Road
Yarmouth
PO41 0QW
- Phone:
- 01983760655
- Email:
- dick@dpdawson.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window