Trustees THE WEST WIGHT ARTS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1081794

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH HUNT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gillian Eleanor Hodson | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Philpot | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Wilkins | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Louise Wedgwood | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE WARNER | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hugh Dawson | Trustee | 07 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
harriet emma gibbins | Trustee | 10 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS JAMES KELMAN | Trustee | 15 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH SARAH WASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH BOWDEN BRETTELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.