THE OSBORNE HOPE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees will for the time being consider applications principally, if not wholly, for grants and donations to be made within the field of Buddhism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 August 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GEORGE OSBORNE HOPE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JANE LESLEY HOPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINA MARIA DE BLOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.86k | £1.63k | £2.10k | £2.58k | £3.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.47k | £14.76k | £4.13k | £12.16k | £33.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 20 JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS OR FINANCIAL PROVISION FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 HIGH STREET
LYMINGTON
HAMPSHIRE
SO41 9ZQ
- Phone:
- 01590625800
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window