NEOC
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion in particular by the promotion and delivery of theological education and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 03 January 2001: Standard registration
- 04 May 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NORTH EAST OECUMENICAL COURSE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £301.65k | £257.26k | £191.53k | £130.65k | £20.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £288.11k | £242.97k | £187.05k | £159.68k | £44.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 28 April 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | 28 April 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 09 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | 09 July 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 22 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 22 July 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 28 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 28 July 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 JULY 1999 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 NOVEMBER 2000 AND 26 APRIL 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROMOTION OF THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window