Governing document TEESSIDE ENVIRONMENTAL TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 30 JANUARY 1998, 1 NOVEMBER 1999, 12 MARCH 2002 AND 29 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED ON 20 FEB 2023 AS AMENDED ON 03 MAR 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, BY: LEASING LAND IN ITS OWNERSHIP TO THIRD PARTIES FOR NATURE CONSERVATION, SUBJECT TO A NATURE CONSERVATION CLAUSE AS DEFINED IN THE ENVIRONMENT ACT 2022; PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGEMENT TO ENABLE THIRD PARTIES TO CREATE PROJECTS OF NATURE CONSERVATION VALUE; PROMOTING NATURE CONSERVATION AND ITS ETHOS AND VALUES BY WAY OF, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, EDUCATION PROGRAMMES; ENTERING INTO AGREEMENTS (WHETHER BY JOINT VENTURE OR OTHERWISE) WITH OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND REPUTABLE THIRD PARTIES, WHETHER COMPANIES OR INDIVIDUALS; RAISING FUNDS AND INVITING AND RECEIVING CONTRIBUTIONS: PROVIDED THAT IN RAISING FUNDS FOR THE CHARITY IT SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE ANY SUBSTANTIAL PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITIES AND SHALL CONFIRM TO ANY STATUTORY REGULATIONS; AND PROMOTING AND ENABLING THE GENERAL PUBLIC TO ENJOY AND APPRECIATE NATURE. NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY STATUTORY PROVISION REGARDING THE MEANING OF THE WORD "CHARITABLE" OR THE WORDS "CHARITABLE PURPOSES" IN FORCE IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
TEESSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.