KIDS KONNECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises holidays and excursions for terminally ill, disabled and disadvantaged children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 October 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAUREEN SUSANNE THOMAS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Darren Kavanagh | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Menara Lee | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Ettrick | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Mary Brady | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Damian Jarnell | Trustee | 22 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE LISMORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.67k | £63.94k | £75.41k | £78.44k | £83.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.44k | £35.76k | £72.07k | £125.19k | £84.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND WHO ARE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED AND ARE SICK (WHETHER OR NOT TERMINALLY ILL) OR MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY DISABLED, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING HOLIDAYS IN EUROPE AND ELSEWHERE FOR SUCH CHILDREN TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Stanley Gardens
LIVERPOOL
L9 3AP
- Phone:
- 01519204452
- Email:
- kidskonnectuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window