THE MAGDI YACOUB INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To carry out research into all aspects of human heart disease including prevention, treatment and rehabilitation. Undertaking and promoting research in relation to cardiac transplant surgery, human heart valves, tissue engineering, circulatory support, immunology of the heart, biochemistry of heart failure, biology of human blood vessels, molecular aspects of heart disease and genetic research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,111,931
Donations and legacies | £1.10m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £13.69k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,562,316
Raising funds | £313.75k | |
Charitable activities | £1.25m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £313.75k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.25m |
People

12 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 October 2000: Standard registration
- 26 January 2017: Funds received from 1125966 MAGDI YACOUB RESEARCH NETWORK
- HAREFIELD RESEARCH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Hatem Abdullah Soliman Aboumarie | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mahmoud Saleh Barbir | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALAN HARGREAVES | Trustee | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ASGHAR KHAGHANI | Trustee | 19 April 2002 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR YACOUB | Trustee | 30 August 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.18m | £1.11m | £2.24m | £889.83k | £1.11m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.37m | £1.23m | £1.43m | £1.58m | £1.56m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £119.71k | £55.87k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.18m | £1.10m | £2.23m | £884.67k | £1.10m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.58k | £376 | £109 | £5.15k | £13.69k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £747.27k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.22m | £1.07m | £1.25m | £1.29m | £1.25m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £147.50k | £162.41k | £180.92k | £286.84k | £313.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £80.70k | £89.83k | £98.28k | £152.50k | £168.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.89m | £3.82m | £3.64m | £3.68m | £3.54m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.30m | £1.39m | £2.25m | £1.58m | £1.25m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £112.85k | £244.70k | £128.56k | £185.77k | £161.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH AUGUST 2000
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE SUCH OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF HUMAN HEART, LUNG AND OTHER DISEASE INCLUDING PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND REHABILITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BY: (1) UNDERTAKING AND PROMOTING RESEARCH (AND MAKING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF PUBLICLY AVAILABLE) IN RELATION TO CARDIAC AND TRANSPLANT SURGERY, HUMAN HEART VALVES AND TISSUE ENGINEERING, CIRCULATORY SUPPORT, IMMUNOLOGY OF HEART AND LUNG DISEASE, BIOCHEMISTRY OF HEART FAILURE, BIOLOGY OF HUMAN BLOOD VESSELS, MOLECULAR ASPECTS OF HEART DISEASE, METABOLISM OF THE HUMAN HEART AND LUNG, TRANSPLANT MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, GENETIC RESEARCH (IN ALL ITS FORMS) AND ANY OTHER MEDICAL MATTER WHICH MIGHT AFFECT AN IMPROVEMENT IN HUMAN HEALTH AND WELLBEING. (11) RELIEVING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM HEART OR OTHER DISEASES BY ENABLING TRANSPLANT AND OTHER OPERATIONS TO BE CARRIED OUT AND ASSOCIATED CARE AND TREATMENT TO BE PROVIDED AT HAREFIELD HOSPITAL OR AT SUCH OTHER SITE AS MAY BE CONVENIENT OR APPROPRIATE; (111) PROVIDING AND CONSTRUCTING AMENITIES, EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES WITHIN THE HAREFIELD HOSPITAL SITE OR ANY LINKED ESTABLISHMENTS OR OTHER APPROPRIATE SITE OR SITES FOR THE TREATMENT AND RESEARCH INTO CARE AND RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM HEART OR OTHER DISEASE, WHO MAY REQUIRE OR WHO ARE TO UNDERGO OR WHO HAVE UNDERGONE TRANSPLANT OR OTHER SURGERY; AND (IV) ANY OTHER MEANS WHICH APPEAR CONVENIENT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heart Science Centre
Hill End Road
Harefield
UXBRIDGE
UB9 6JH
- Phone:
- 01895 760730
- Email:
- maria@magdiyacoub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window