Financial history THE INDIAN MUSLIM RELIEF COMMITTEE OF THE UK

Charity number: 1089090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £15.79k £15.06k £15.06k £0 £0
Total expenditure £30.05k £20.02k £20.02k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A