THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S PARISH CHURCH, UTTOXETER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The maintenance of the church building exterior and interior. Since its inception the Friends have had new heating installed. The kitchen and toilet areas have been improved including the disabled toilets. New exterior lighting has been fitted, doors and gates have been refurbished. Work has been finalised on the tower and roof renovation during 2010.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 28 July 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Stuart Langford | Chair | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Doughty Langford | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Dianne Elizabeth Heath | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|||||
SUSAN FLETCHER | Trustee | 05 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MARVIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCES ELIZABETH HODGSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CYNTHIA WHITMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EILEEN MARY SMITH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £281 | £4.10k | £8 | £35 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.62k | £0 | £0 | £11.34k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 December 2024 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 July 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAY 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY'S UTTOXETER IN THE DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD AND THE MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH
Area of benefit
UTTOXETER
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 Westlands Road
Uttoxeter
Staffordshire
ST14 8DL
- Phone:
- 018889 564997
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window