WORLD ANIMAL PROTECTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We move the world to protect animals. We work globally with local partners, animal welfare organisations and businesses, and we influence decision makers internationally, nationally and locally. We have formal relationships with key international bodies including the Food and Agriculture Organization, the UN Environment Programme, the Council of Europe and the World Organisation for Animal Health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£29,636,942
Donations and legacies | £29.13m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £11.53k | |
Investments | £497.86k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£36,145,924
Raising funds | £7.13m | |
Charitable activities | £29.01m | |
Other | £0 |
£547,976 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £52,097 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £7.13m | |
Charitable expenditure | £29.01m |
People

231 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 15 |
£70k to £80k | 15 |
£80k to £90k | 12 |
£90k to £100k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 7 |
£110k to £120k | 3 |
£120k to £130k | 4 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Australia
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Canada
- China
- Costa Rica
- Denmark
- India
- Italy
- Kenya
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Philippines
- Romania
- Sweden
- Thailand
- United States
- Vietnam
Governance
- 04 August 2000: Standard registration
- 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
- WSPA (Working name)
- THE WORLD SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF ANIMALS (Previous name)
- WORLD ANIMAL PROTECTION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEARBHAIL ADRIENNE USHER | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Sol Oyuela Jefferies | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tigere Chagutah | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ka Keung Christopher Fung | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Svetlana Ignatieva | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Craig | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Berangere Andree Mireille Michel | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Franc Cortada | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Lynn Bereti | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ireland | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.00m | £31.37m | £32.60m | £38.31m | £29.64m | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.64m | £31.28m | £27.80m | £31.82m | £36.15m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £83.76k | £11.46k | N/A | N/A | £52.10k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £32.77m | £31.22m | £32.48m | £38.16m | £29.13m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £33.00k | £32.72k | £27.00k | £11.53k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £19.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £207.00k | £117.00k | £86.26k | £127.65k | £497.86k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £4.91m | £5.60m | £9.23m | £13.51m | £9.40m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £31.51m | £25.46m | £22.18m | £25.77m | £29.01m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £7.12m | £5.82m | £5.63m | £6.05m | £7.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £636.00k | £626.00k | £482.01k | £632.04k | £1.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.52m | £1.80m | £1.62m | £1.60m | £1.43m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £15.00k | £13.00k | £8.38k | £7.77k | £7.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £291.00k | £253.00k | £324.17k | £327.43k | £740.98k | |
|
Long-term investments | £5.85m | £6.30m | £5.33m | £4.63m | £5.12m | |
|
Other assets | £11.01m | £11.10m | £16.37m | £24.03m | £17.20m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.93m | £2.95m | £2.15m | £2.86m | £3.41m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/11/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/11/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 MAR 2016 as amended on 13 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PREVENT OR SUPPRESS CRUELTY AND TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS AND TO DO ALL SUCH LAWFUL ACTS AS THE SOCIETY MAY CONSIDER TO BE CONDUCIVE OR INCIDENTAL TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THOSE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3rd Floor
86 - 90 Paul Street
London
EC2A 4NE
- Phone:
- 02072390525
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window