Financial history RESEARCH ECHOCARDIOGRAPHY

Charity number: 1082940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £128.36k £0 £53.08k £89.75k £90.75k
Total expenditure £67.79k £10.89k £39.59k £75.25k £72.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A